Councillor Richard Watters GeneralCommitteesOutside BodiesMembers InterestsSurgeries Elected: 05 May 2017 First Elected 05 May 2017 Party: Scottish National Party Ward: Ward 8 - Kinross-shire Address: c/o Perth & Kinross Council2 High StreetPerthPH1 5PH Email: RWatters@pkc.gov.uk Telephone No: 01738 475044 Mobile Telephone No: 07557 812513 Biography: SNP Councillor for Kinross-shire and Glenfarg, first elected in 2017. Standing up for our communities throughout the whole ward. WATTERS Richard - Privacy Notice.pdf WATTERS Richard - Data Protection Policy.pdf Job Title: Department: Election History ElectedRetiredReason Fri 5 May 2017 Party Representation History PartyFromTo Scottish National PartyFri 5 May 2017 Ward Representation History WardFromTo Ward 8 - Kinross-shireFri 5 May 2017 Current Committee Memberships Committee - Date JoinedRole 12 Page 1 of 2, items 1 to 5 of 8. Climate Change and Sustainability Committee - 25 May 2022 Convener Development Management Committee - 17 May 2017 Member Kinross Common Good Fund Committee - 11 September 2023 Member Kinross-shire Committee - 25 May 2022 Vice-Convener Local Review Body - 25 May 2022 Member Past Committee Memberships Past Committee - Date JoinedPast RolePast Leaving Date 123 Page 1 of 3, items 1 to 5 of 12. Environment, Infrastructure and Economic Development Committee - 21 June 2022 Member05 December 2023 Environment and Infrastructure Committee - 25 May 2022 Member22 June 2022 Planning and Development Management Committee - 04 October 2017 Member05 May 2022 Perth and Kinross Council - 05 May 2017 Member05 May 2022 Kinross Common Good Fund Committee - 05 May 2017 Member05 May 2022 Current Outside Body Appointments Outside BodyJoining Date Perth & Kinross Countryside Trust - Executive Committee 25 May 2022 Tayside & Central Scotland Transport Partnership (TACTRAN) 25 May 2022 Past Outside Body Appointments Past Outside BodyPast Joining DatePast Leaving Date Perth & Kinross Sports Council 17 May 2017 05 May 2022 Personal Register of Interests Date of NoticeReceipt by Monitoring OfficerView 26 April 202426 April 2024 Meeting Declarations Committee NameMeeting DateNatureView Licensing Committee18 February 2021Non-Pecuniary DateTitleNotes There are no training records for this member. DateFromDescriptionValue There are no hospitality and gift records for this member. Member Attendance Display attendance in date range From: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * To: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * * Attendance Summary SummaryCountPercentage Expected attendances15 Present as expected1387% Absent213% Apologies received2100% of absences In attendance (as a visitor)0 Attendance Details Meeting DateCommitteeAttendance 20 Sep 2023 09:30 Environment, Infrastructure and Economic Development Committee Attended 4 Oct 2023 10:30 Perth and Kinross Council Attended 11 Oct 2023 09:30 Planning and Placemaking Committee Apologies received 1 Nov 2023 09:30 Environment, Infrastructure and Economic Development Committee Attended 15 Nov 2023 09:30 Planning and Placemaking Committee Attended 16 Nov 2023 10:30 Local Review Body Attended 16 Nov 2023 17:00 Kinross-shire Committee Attended 27 Nov 2023 09:30 Climate Change and Sustainability Committee Attended 6 Dec 2023 10:30 Perth and Kinross Council Attended 13 Dec 2023 09:30 Planning and Placemaking Committee Attended 10 Jan 2024 09:30 Planning and Placemaking Committee Apologies received 22 Jan 2024 13:00 Perth and Kinross Council Attended 7 Feb 2024 09:30 Planning and Placemaking Committee Attended 14 Feb 2024 09:30 Climate Change and Sustainability Committee Attended 15 Feb 2024 17:00 Kinross-shire Committee Attended